Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mauro Aparecido dos Santos

Deceased

Archbishop of Cascavel, Parana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1954Born
13 May 198429.5Ordained PriestPriest of Jacarezinho, Parana, Brazil
27 May 199843.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Campo Mourão, Parana, Brazil
14 Aug 199843.7Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Campo Mourão, Parana, Brazil
21 Feb 199944.2SucceededBishop of Campo Mourão, Parana, Brazil
9 May 200247.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Umuarama, Parana, Brazil
13 Dec 200248.0CeasedApostolic Administrator of Umuarama, Parana, Brazil
31 Oct 200752.9AppointedArchbishop of Cascavel, Parana, Brazil
25 Jan 200853.2InstalledArchbishop of Cascavel, Parana, Brazil
11 Mar 202166.3DiedArchbishop of Cascavel, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Mauro Aparecido dos Santos
Archbishop Mauro Aparecido dos Santos (born , died ) Archbishop of Cascavel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFartura
Ordained PriestImaculada Conceição, Cathedral, Jacarezinho, Diocese of Jacarezinho, Parana
Ordained BishopImaculada Conceição, Cathedral, Jacarezinho, Diocese of Jacarezinho, Parana
Death PlaceSão Lucas, Hospital, Cascavel, Archdiocese of Cascavel, Parana
Buried Place (Original)Central, Cemetery, Cascavel, Archdiocese of Cascavel, Parana

  • a priest for 36.8 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 31 Oct 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,368
  • d: CB, 11 Mar 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Mar 2021

Quantcast