Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marek Marian Piatek, C.SS.R.

Bishop of Coari, Amazonas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1954 BornTuchów, Poland
15 Aug 197419.8ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
5 Jun 198025.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
15 Jun 201156.7AppointedPrelate of Coari, Amazonas, Brazil
12 Aug 201156.8Ordained BishopPrelate of Coari, Amazonas, Brazil
23 Oct 201157.0InstalledPrelate of Coari, Amazonas, Brazil
9 Oct 201359.0AppointedBishop of Coari, Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Marek Marian Piatek:
Bishop Marek Marian Piatek C.SS.R. (born ) Bishop of Coari

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Coari.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 26 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,127
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Oct 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 9 Oct 2013