Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vicente Costa

Bishop of Jundiaí, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1947 BornBirkirkara, Malta
17 Dec 197226.0Ordained PriestPriest of Malta
1 Jul 199851.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Londrina, Parana, Brazil
1 Jul 199851.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Flaviae
19 Sep 199851.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae Flaviae
9 Oct 200255.8AppointedBishop of Umuarama, Parana, Brazil
13 Dec 200255.9InstalledBishop of Umuarama, Parana, Brazil
30 Dec 200963.0AppointedBishop of Jundiaí, Sao Paulo, Brazil
7 Mar 201063.2InstalledBishop of Jundiaí, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Vicente Costa:
Bishop Vicente Costa (born ) Bishop of Jundiaí

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jundiaí.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Dec 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,428

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013