Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Estevam dos Santos Silva Filho

Bishop of Ruy Barbosa (Rui Barbosa), Bahia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1968 Born
9 Jun 199527.1Ordained PriestPriest of Vitória da Conquista, Bahia, Brazil
29 Jan 201445.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
29 Jan 201445.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Feradi Maius
30 Mar 201445.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Feradi Maius
15 Apr 202052.0AppointedBishop of Ruy Barbosa (Rui Barbosa), Bahia, Brazil
12 Jul 202052.2InstalledBishop of Ruy Barbosa (Rui Barbosa), Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Estevam dos Santos Silva Filho
Bishop Estevam dos Santos Silva Filho (born ) Bishop of Ruy Barbosa (Rui Barbosa)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVitória da Conquista, Archdiocese of Vitória da Conquista, Bahia
Ordained BishopGinásio de Esportes Raul Ferraz, Vitória da Conquista, Archdiocese of Vitória da Conquista, Bahia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ruy Barbosa (Rui Barbosa).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Jan 2014
  • ob: CB, 29 Jan 2014
  • c2+: CB, 15 Feb 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,124
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Apr 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 19 Apr 2020

Quantcast