Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bruno Elizeu Versari

Bishop of Campo Mourão, Parana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1959 Born
5 Jul 198728.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Maringá, Parana, Brazil
3 Jan 198828.5Ordained PriestPriest of Maringá, Parana, Brazil
19 Apr 201757.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Campo Mourão, Parana, Brazil
25 Jun 201758.0Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Campo Mourão, Parana, Brazil
6 Dec 201758.5SucceededBishop of Campo Mourão, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Bruno Elizeu Versari
Bishop Bruno Elizeu Versari (born ) Bishop of Campo Mourão

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCândido Mota, Diocese of Assis, Sao Paulo
Ordained DeaconNossa Senhora da Gloria, Cathedral Basilica, Maringá, Archdiocese of Maringá, Parana
Ordained PriestNossa Senhora do Rosário, Floresta, Diocese of Floresta, Pernambuco
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora da Gloria, Cathedral Basilica, Maringá, Archdiocese of Maringá, Parana

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Campo Mourão.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Apr 2017
  • ob/od/c01: CB, 19 Apr 2017
  • c2+: CB, 3 May 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Number 19,453
  • s: Bollettino, 6 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast