Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vilson Basso, S.C.I.

Bishop of Imperatriz, Maranhão, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1960 Born
25 Feb 198525.0Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
28 Dec 198525.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
19 Mar 201050.0AppointedBishop of Caxias do Maranhão, Brazil
30 May 201050.2Ordained BishopBishop of Caxias do Maranhão, Brazil
19 Jun 201050.3InstalledBishop of Caxias do Maranhão, Brazil
19 Apr 201757.1AppointedBishop of Imperatriz, Maranhão, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Vilson Basso
Bishop Vilson Basso S.C.I. (born ) Bishop of Imperatriz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCinquentenário Tuparendi, Diocese of Santo Ângelo, Rio Grande do Sul

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Imperatriz.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Mar 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,652
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Apr 2017