Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Cooke

Deceased

Bishop of Trois Rivières, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1792Born
9 Sep 181422.5Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jun 185260.3AppointedBishop of Trois Rivières, Québec, Canada
18 Oct 185260.6Ordained BishopBishop of Trois Rivières, Québec, Canada
30 Apr 187078.2DiedBishop of Trois Rivières, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Thomas Cooke (VIAF: 43830989)
Bishop Thomas Cooke (born , died ) Bishop of Trois Rivières

EventPlace
Birth PlacePointe-du-Lac

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 566
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,393
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1852, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 19 Sep 2017