Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward John Horan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kingston, Ontario

Titular Bishop of Chrysopolis in Arabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1817BornQuebec City
22 Sep 184224.9Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jan 185840.2AppointedBishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada
1 May 185840.5Ordained BishopBishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada
28 May 187456.6ResignedBishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada
16 Jun 187456.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Chrysopolis in Arabia
15 Feb 187557.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Kingston, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Edward John Horan:
Bishop Edward John Horan (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kingston

  • a priest for 32.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 203, and Page 479

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013