Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maurice-Auguste-Eugène Foin

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Le Mans, France

Titular Bishop of Ionopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1882Born
7 Jul 190724.5Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jun 193956.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Le Mans, France
10 Jun 193956.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Ionopolis
8 Sep 193956.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ionopolis
10 Jul 194865.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Le Mans, France

MicroData Summary for Maurice-Auguste-Eugène Foin
Bishop Maurice-Auguste-Eugène Foin (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Le Mans

EventPlace
Birth PlacePontvallain

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1939, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast