Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alois Scheiwiler

Deceased

Bishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1872Born
21 Mar 189623.9Ordained PriestPriest of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
23 Jun 193058.2SelectedBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
28 Aug 193058.3ConfirmedBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
5 Oct 193058.5Ordained BishopBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
20 Jul 193866.2DiedBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Alois Scheiwiler
Bishop Alois Scheiwiler (born , died ) Bishop of Sankt Gallen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGossau

  • a priest for 42.3 years
  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast