Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Aldo Laghi

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Chile

Titular Archbishop of Nicaea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1883BornBrisighella, Italy
1912²28.3Ordained PriestPriest
28 Aug 193855.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Chile
28 Aug 193855.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
18 Sep 193855.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
2 Jan 194258.3DiedApostolic Nuncio to Chile

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Aldo Laghi:
Archbishop Aldo Laghi (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Chile

  • a priest for 30.0 years
  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013