Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Áureo Patricio Bonilla Bonilla, O.F.M.

Vicar Apostolic of Galápagos

Titular Bishop of Bida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1968 BornRiobamba
10 Oct 199325.4Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
20 Jun 199628.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
29 Oct 201345.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Galápagos, Ecuador
29 Oct 201345.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Bida
7 Dec 201345.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bida

MicroData Summary for Áureo Patricio Bonilla Bonilla:
Bishop Áureo Patricio Bonilla Bonilla O.F.M. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Galápagos

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Galápagos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Oct 2013
  • ob: CB, 6 Nov 2013
  • c2: CB, 8 Dec 2013
  • c3+: CB, 11 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 12 Dec 2013