Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adelio Pasqualotto, C.S.I.

Vicar Apostolic of Napo, Ecuador

Titular Bishop of Abthugni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1950 Born
27 Sep 196717.4ProfessedMember of Congregation of Saint Joseph
13 Oct 197323.4Solemn VowsMember of Congregation of Saint Joseph
11 Mar 197827.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Saint Joseph
12 Dec 201464.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Napo, Ecuador
12 Dec 201464.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Abthugni
7 Mar 201564.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abthugni

MicroData Summary for Adelio Pasqualotto
Bishop Adelio Pasqualotto C.S.I. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Napo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNovoledo di Villaverla, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Napo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Dec 2014
  • ob: CB, 17 Dec 2014
  • c2: CB, 5 Mar 2015
  • c34: CB, 8 Mar 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,381

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast