Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guido Iván Minda Chalá

Auxiliary Bishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador

Titular Bishop of Nisa in Lycia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1960 Born
27 Jun 199838.3Ordained PriestPriest of Ibarra, Ecuador
4 Nov 200949.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador
4 Nov 200949.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Nisa in Lycia
28 Nov 200949.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nisa in Lycia
13 Oct 201858.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ibarra, Ecuador
1 Feb 202059.9CeasedApostolic Administrator of Ibarra, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Guido Iván Minda Chalá
Bishop Guido Iván Minda Chalá (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Guayaquil

EventPlace
Birth PlaceApula
Ordained BishopCathedral, Guayaquil, Archdiocese of Guayaquil

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Guayaquil.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Nov 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Number 16,319
  • ab: CB, 13 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast