Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Oswaldo Patricio Vintimilla Cabrera

Bishop of Azogues


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1966 BornCuenca
17 Nov 199024.2Ordained PriestPriest of Cuenca, Ecuador
25 Jun 201649.8AppointedBishop of Azogues, Ecuador
20 Aug 201650.0Ordained BishopBishop of Azogues, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Oswaldo Patricio Vintimilla Cabrera
Bishop Oswaldo Patricio Vintimilla Cabrera (born ) Bishop of Azogues

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Azogues.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Jun 2016
  • ob: CB, 27 Jun 2016
  • c2+: CB, 20 Aug 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,078

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 1 Oct 2016