Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Piccioli

Auxiliary Bishop of Guayaquil

Titular Bishop of Patara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1957 BornErbusco, Italy
12 Jun 198224.9Ordained PriestPriest
26 Oct 201356.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador
26 Oct 201356.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Patara
8 Feb 201456.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Patara

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Piccioli:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Piccioli (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Guayaquil

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Guayaquil.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Oct 2013
  • ob: CB, 10 Jan 2014
  • c2+: CB, 9 Feb 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 10 Feb 2014