Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Ján Kuboš

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Spiš, Slovakia

Titular Bishop of Quiza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1966 Born
18 Jun 198923.3Ordained PriestPriest of Spiš, Slovakia
25 Mar 202054.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Spiš, Slovakia
25 Mar 202054.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Quiza
24 Jun 202054.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Quiza

MicroData Summary for Ján Kuboš
Father Ján Kuboš (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Spiš

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrstená
Ordained PriestBratislava, Archdiocese of Trnava
Ordained BishopSaint Martin, Cathedral, Spišská Kapitula, Diocese of Spiš

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Spiš.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2020
  • ob/c1: CB, 20 May 2020
  • c2+: CB, 22 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 23 May 2020

Quantcast