Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Domingo Ulloa Mendieta, O.S.A.

Archbishop of Panamá


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1956 BornChitré
17 Dec 198326.9Ordained PriestPriest of Chitré, Panama
10 Sep 198831.7ProfessedPriest of Order of St. Augustine
28 Aug 199134.6Solemn ProfessedPriest of Order of St. Augustine
26 Feb 200447.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Panamá
26 Feb 200447.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Naratcata
17 Apr 200447.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Naratcata
18 Feb 201053.1AppointedArchbishop of Panamá

MicroData Summary for José Domingo Ulloa Mendieta:
Archbishop José Domingo Ulloa Mendieta O.S.A. (born ) Archbishop of Panamá

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Panamá.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,573
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2010

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015