Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valter Dario Maggi

Bishop of Ibarra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1956 BornBrignano Gera d’Adda, Italy
15 Jun 198528.8Ordained PriestPriest of Foggia-Bovino, Italy
19 Feb 200851.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador
19 Feb 200851.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Bossa
5 Apr 200851.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bossa
25 Mar 201154.6AppointedBishop of Ibarra, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Valter Dario Maggi:
Bishop Valter Dario Maggi (born ) Bishop of Ibarra

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ibarra.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Feb 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,722
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013