Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Giovanny Pazmiño Abril, O.P.

Bishop of Ambato, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1965 Born
16 Dec 199530.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
20 Jan 201549.5AppointedBishop of Ambato, Ecuador
21 Mar 201549.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ambato, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Jorge Giovanny Pazmiño Abril
Bishop Jorge Giovanny Pazmiño Abril O.P. (born ) Bishop of Ambato

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaños

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ambato.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Jan 2015
  • ob: CB, 22 Jan 2015
  • c2: CB, 21 Mar 2015
  • c34: CB, 22 Mar 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,391

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast