Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luis Gerardo Cabrera Herrera, O.F.M.

Archbishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1955 Born
3 Sep 198327.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
20 Apr 200953.5AppointedArchbishop of Cuenca, Ecuador
4 Jul 200953.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cuenca, Ecuador
24 Sep 201559.9AppointedArchbishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Luis Gerardo Cabrera Herrera
Archbishop Luis Gerardo Cabrera Herrera O.F.M. (born ) Archbishop of Guayaquil

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAzogues

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Guayaquil.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Apr 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,243
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Sep 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast