Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre-Marie Osouf, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Tōkyō


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1829BornCérisy-la-Salle, France
11 Jul 185223.1Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
19 Dec 187647.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern Japan
19 Dec 187647.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Arsinoë in Arcadia
11 Feb 187747.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arsinoë in Arcadia
15 Jun 189162.1AppointedArchbishop of Tōkyō, Japan
27 Jun 190677.1DiedArchbishop of Tōkyō, Japan

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Marie Osouf:
Archbishop Pierre-Marie Osouf M.E.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Tōkyō

  • a priest for 54.0 years
  • a bishop for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 124, and Page 557

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013