Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jules-Alphonse Cousin, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nagasaki


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1842BornChambretaud, France
27 Apr 186422.0ProfessedMember of La Société des Missions Etrangères
23 Dec 186523.7Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
26 Jun 188543.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southern Japan
26 Jun 188543.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Acmonia
21 Sep 188543.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acmonia
15 Jun 189149.2AppointedBishop of Nagasaki, Japan
18 Sep 191169.4DiedBishop of Nagasaki, Japan

MicroData Summary for Jules-Alphonse Cousin:
Bishop Jules-Alphonse Cousin M.E.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Nagasaki

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 73, and Page 400

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013