Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard-Thadée Petitjean, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Southern Japan

Titular Bishop of Myriophytos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1829BornBlanzy-sur-Bourbince, France
21 May 185323.9Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
11 May 186636.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Japan
11 May 186636.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Myriophytos
21 Oct 186637.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Myriophytos
20 Jun 187647.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southern Japan
7 Oct 188455.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Southern Japan

MicroData Summary for Bernard-Thadée Petitjean:
Bishop Bernard-Thadée Petitjean M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Southern Japan

  • a priest for 31.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 399

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013