Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Félix-Nicolas-Joseph Midon, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Osaka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1840BornBonviller, France
21 May 186424.0Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
23 Mar 188847.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Central Japan
23 Mar 188847.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesaropolis
11 Jun 188848.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caesaropolis
15 Jun 189151.1AppointedBishop of Osaka, Japan
12 Apr 189352.9DiedBishop of Osaka, Japan

MicroData Summary for Félix-Nicolas-Joseph Midon:
Bishop Félix-Nicolas-Joseph Midon M.E.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Osaka

  • a priest for 28.9 years
  • a bishop for 4.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 168, and Page 429

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013