Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anselm Umoren, M.S.P.N.

Auxiliary Bishop of Abuja, Nigeria

Titular Bishop of Scampa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1962 Born
18 Jun 198826.1Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Society of Saint Paul of Nigeria
8 Nov 201149.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Abuja, Nigeria
8 Nov 201149.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Scampa
2 Feb 201249.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Scampa

MicroData Summary for Anselm Umoren
Bishop Anselm Umoren M.S.P.N. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Abuja

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUkana Nto

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Abuja.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Nov 2011
  • ob: CB, 19 Dec 2011
  • c2+: CB, 5 Feb 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,250

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast