Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Ekwoy Apochi

Bishop of Otukpo, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1960 Born
19 Jul 198625.9Ordained PriestPriest of Makurdi, Nigeria
10 Jul 199534.9IncardinatedPriest of Otukpo, Nigeria
17 Dec 200242.3AppointedBishop of Otukpo, Nigeria
23 Feb 200342.5Ordained BishopBishop of Otukpo, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Michael Ekwoy Apochi
Bishop Michael Ekwoy Apochi (born ) Bishop of Otukpo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIchama District

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Otukpo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,337

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018