Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Ilorin

Dioecesis Ilorinensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Ayo-Maria Atoyebi, O.P., Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 29 May 1969
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Ibadan
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Nigeria
  • Square Kilometers: 32,500 (12,553 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, P.O. Box 686, 16 Umar Audi Rd., Tanke Junction, Ilorin, Kwara State, Nigeria
  • Telephone: (031)22.22.92
  • Fax: 22.25.72

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Ilorin
20 January 1960ErectedDiocese of Ondo Prefecture Apostolic of Ilorin (erected)
Diocese of Ilorin
29 May 1969ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Ilorin Diocese of Ilorin
15 December 1995Territory LostDiocese of Ilorin
Diocese of Minna
Diocese of Sokoto
Prefecture Apostolic of Kontagora (erected)
2009Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Ilorin (from Kaduna)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Ilorin
197012,1001,200,0001.0%1515806166ap1971
198023,3001,529,0001.5%117181,2941913ap1981
199044,3501,372,0003.2%717241,847173817ap1991
199956,7721,887,8283.0%237301,89275318ap2000
200058,8031,396,5154.2%247311,89675318ap2001
200158,8031,396,5154.2%337401,47076217ap2002
200222,650250,0009.1%3474155293217ap2003
200326,642280,0009.5%33942634176318ap2004
200425,5001,260,0002.0%33740637167218ap2005
200628,0001,330,0002.1%3633971756418ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.1, 20 Jul 2013; data: 22 Jul 2013