Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hilary Paul Odili Okeke

Bishop of Nnewi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1947 BornUtuh
20 Apr 197427.2Ordained PriestPriest of Onitsha, Nigeria
9 Nov 200154.8AppointedBishop of Nnewi, Nigeria
10 Feb 200255.1Ordained BishopBishop of Nnewi, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Hilary Paul Odili Okeke:
Bishop Hilary Paul Odili Okeke (born ) Bishop of Nnewi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nnewi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,132

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 9 Oct 2013