Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Danlami Bagobiri

Deceased

Bishop of Kafanchan, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1957Born
11 Jun 198325.5Ordained PriestPriest of Kaduna, Nigeria
10 Jul 199537.6AppointedBishop of Kafanchan, Nigeria
21 Oct 199537.9Ordained BishopBishop of Kafanchan, Nigeria
27 Feb 201860.3DiedBishop of Kafanchan, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Joseph Danlami Bagobiri
Bishop Joseph Danlami Bagobiri (born , died ) Bishop of Kafanchan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFadan Kagoma
Ordained BishopSaint Peter Claver, Cathedral, Kafanchan, Diocese of Kafanchan

  • a priest for 34.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,624
  • d: CB, 27 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast