Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Matthew Ishaya Audu

Archbishop of Jos, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1959 Born
23 Jun 198425.0Ordained PriestPriest of Makurdi, Nigeria
5 Dec 200041.4AppointedBishop of Lafia, Nigeria
31 Mar 200141.8Ordained BishopBishop of Lafia, Nigeria
6 Jan 202060.5AppointedArchbishop of Jos, Nigeria
31 Mar 202060.8InstalledArchbishop of Jos, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Matthew Ishaya Audu
Archbishop Matthew Ishaya Audu (born ) Archbishop of Jos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRafin-Pa, Diocese of Oturkpo
Ordained BishopNasarawa Polytechnic College, Lafia, Diocese of Lafia

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Jos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 13,961
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Jan 2020
  • i: CB, 6 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast