Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Gobal Gokum

Bishop of Pankshin, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1964 Born
16 Nov 199127.7Ordained PriestPriest of Jos, Nigeria
18 Mar 201450.0AppointedBishop of Pankshin, Nigeria
12 Jun 201450.3Ordained BishopBishop of Pankshin, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Michael Gobal Gokum
Bishop Michael Gobal Gokum (born ) Bishop of Pankshin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKadyis

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pankshin.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Mar 2014
  • ob: CB, 12 Jun 2014
  • c2+: CB, 13 Jun 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,181

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast