Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arkadiusz Lisiecki

Deceased

Bishop of Katowice, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1880Born
17 Dec 190424.9Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jun 192646.4AppointedBishop of Katowice, Poland
24 Oct 192646.7Ordained BishopBishop of Katowice, Poland
13 May 193050.3DiedBishop of Katowice, Poland

MicroData Summary for Arkadiusz Lisiecki
Bishop Arkadiusz Lisiecki (born , died ) Bishop of Katowice

EventPlace
Birth PlacePoznan

  • a priest for 25.4 years
  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast