Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albert Ndongmo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nkongsamba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1926BornBafou
21 Dec 195529.2Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jun 196437.7AppointedBishop of Nkongsamba, Cameroon
16 Aug 196437.9Ordained BishopBishop of Nkongsamba, Cameroon
29 Jan 197346.3ResignedBishop of Nkongsamba, Cameroon
29 May 199265.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Nkongsamba, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Albert Ndongmo:
Bishop Albert Ndongmo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nkongsamba

  • a priest for 36.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013