Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Nkongsamba

Dioecesis Nkongsambensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 14 September 1955
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Douala
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Cameroon
  • Square Kilometers: 3,723 (1,438 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, B.P. 333, Nkongsamba, Cameroun
  • Telephone: 3349.1160
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Adamaua
28 April 1914ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Adamaua (erected)
11 June 1923Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Adamaua
Prefecture Apostolic of Foumban
11 June 1923Name ChangedPrefecture Apostolic of Adamaua Prefecture Apostolic of Foumban
Vicariate Apostolic of Foumban
28 May 1934ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Foumban Vicariate Apostolic of Foumban
28 May 1940Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Foumban
Vicariate Apostolic of Oubangui Chari
Prefecture Apostolic of Berbérati (erected)
28 April 1942Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Dahomey
Vicariate Apostolic of Foumban
Prefecture Apostolic of Ghardaďa nel Sahara
Prefecture Apostolic of Jos
Prefecture Apostolic of Kaduna
Vicariate Apostolic of Khartoum
Vicariate Apostolic of Ouagadougou
Prefecture Apostolic of Niamey (erected)
9 January 1947Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Foumban Prefecture Apostolic of Garoua (erected)
9 January 1947Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Berbérati
Vicariate Apostolic of Foumban
Vicariate Apostolic of Khartoum
Prefecture Apostolic of Fort-Lamy (erected)
Diocese of Nkongsamba
14 September 1955ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Foumban Diocese of Nkongsamba
5 February 1970Territory LostDiocese of Nkongsamba Diocese of Bafoussam (erected)
26 May 2012Territory LostDiocese of Nkongsamba Diocese of Bafang (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Nkongsamba
1970104,882508,00020.6%2124452,330525827ap1971
1980182,292365,00049.9%2418424,340373833ap1981
1990270,650663,50040.8%439525,204204750ap1991
1999315,000896,11535.2%608684,632284740ap2000
2000315,000896,11535.2%659744,256294740ap2001
2001316,632897,90835.3%6511764,166141540ap2002
2002319,170908,86735.1%6513784,091162456ap2003
2003310,817994,83331.2%6910793,934155351ap2004
2004319,549667,26847.9%669754,260155152ap2005
2011365,000768,00047.5%8411953,842406079ap2012
2012192,547707,71627.2%6410742,6015671bul:26May2012

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 31 May 2013