Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Mongo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Douala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1914BornNkon Ngada
24 Feb 194329.1Ordained PriestPriest of Douala, Cameroon
21 Nov 195541.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Douala, Cameroon
21 Nov 195541.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Botriana
26 Feb 195642.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Botriana
5 Jul 195743.5AppointedBishop of Douala, Cameroon
29 Aug 197359.6ResignedBishop of Douala, Cameroon
17 Mar 198874.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Douala, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Thomas Mongo:
Bishop Thomas Mongo (born 1914, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Douala

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 32.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015