Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Benjamín Cardinal de Arriba y Castro

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Tarragona

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Vitale, Valeria, Gervasio e Protasio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1886BornSanta María de Peñamayor
14 Jul 191226.3Ordained PriestPriest
1 May 193549.1AppointedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
16 Jun 193549.2Ordained BishopBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
8 Aug 194458.3AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
22 Jan 194962.8AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
12 Jan 195366.8Elevated to Cardinal
29 Oct 195367.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Vitale, Valeria, Gervasio e Protasio
19 Nov 197084.6RetiredArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
8 Mar 197386.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Tarragona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Benjamín de Arriba y Castro:
Cardinal Benjamín de Arriba y Castro (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Tarragona

  • a priest for 60.7 years
  • a bishop for 37.7 years
  • a cardinal for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 45
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013