Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Felix Romero Menjibar

Deceased

Archbishop of Valladolid, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1901Born
29 May 192624.5Ordained PriestPriest of Córdoba, Spain
16 Jan 195452.1AppointedBishop of Jaén, Spain
2 May 195452.4Ordained BishopBishop of Jaén, Spain
2 Jul 197068.6AppointedArchbishop of Valladolid, Spain
12 Sep 197068.8InstalledArchbishop of Valladolid, Spain
21 Sep 197472.8DiedArchbishop of Valladolid, Spain

MicroData Summary for Felix Romero Menjibar
Archbishop Felix Romero Menjibar (born , died ) Archbishop of Valladolid

EventPlace
Birth PlacePriego

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast