Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Javier Santos Santiago, I.E.M.E. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of San Jorge, Colombia

Titular Bishop of Thebae Phthiotides


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1894Born
16 Mar 191824.0Ordained PriestPriest of Instituto Español de San Francisco Javier para Misiones Extranjeras
12 Mar 195056.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of San Jorge, Colombia
12 Mar 195056.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Thebae Phthiotides
9 Jul 195056.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thebae Phthiotides
25 Dec 195763.8DiedVicar Apostolic of San Jorge, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Francisco Javier Santos Santiago
Bishop Francisco Javier Santos Santiago I.E.M.E. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of San Jorge

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBermillo de Sayago, Spain

  • a priest for 39.7 years
  • a bishop for 7.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: CB, 15 Jul 2012
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1950, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast