Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ángel Temiño Sáiz

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Orense, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1910Born
29 Jul 193423.8Ordained PriestPriest
8 Oct 195242.0AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
30 Nov 195242.2Ordained BishopBishop of Orense, Spain
15 May 198776.6RetiredBishop of Orense, Spain
19 Sep 199181.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Orense, Spain

MicroData Summary for Ángel Temiño Sáiz
Bishop Ángel Temiño Sáiz (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Orense

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSarracín

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 38.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 110

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast