Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francisco Javier Cardinal de Cienfuegos y Jovellanos

Deceased

Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1766BornOviedo
21 Feb 181952.9SelectedBishop of Cádiz, Spain
4 Jun 181953.2ConfirmedBishop of Cádiz, Spain
22 Aug 181953.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cádiz, Spain
26 Oct 182458.6SelectedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
20 Dec 182458.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
13 Mar 182660.0Elevated to Cardinal
28 Feb 183164.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo
21 Jun 184781.2DiedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Javier de Cienfuegos y Jovellanos
Francisco Javier Cardinal de Cienfuegos y Jovellanos (born , died ) Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

  • a bishop for 27.8 years
  • a cardinal for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 200, and Page 217
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 138, Number 746
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1819, Number 43
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 Mar 1826

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Jul 2016