Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Máximo Yurramendi Alcáin

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain

Titular Bishop of Messene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jul 1897Born
19 Mar 192224.6Ordained PriestPriest
25 Nov 194548.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
25 Nov 194548.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Messene
31 Mar 194648.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Messene
25 Jan 194951.4DiedApostolic Administrator of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Máximo Yurramendi Alcáin
Bishop Máximo Yurramendi Alcáin (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Ciudad Rodrigo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUrnieta

  • a priest for 26.8 years
  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1946, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast