Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Juan de la Cruz Ignacio Cardinal Moreno y Maisanove

Deceased

Archbishop of Toledo, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1817Born
1 Jul 184931.6Ordained PriestPriest
1 Aug 185739.6SelectedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
25 Sep 185739.8ConfirmedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
8 Dec 185740.0Ordained BishopBishop of Oviedo, Spain
25 Apr 186345.4SelectedArchbishop of Valladolid, Spain
1 Oct 186345.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Valladolid, Spain
10 Jan 186446.1InstalledArchbishop of Valladolid, Spain
13 Mar 186850.3Elevated to Cardinal
22 Nov 186951.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace
4 Jun 187557.5SelectedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
5 Jul 187557.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
28 Aug 188466.7DiedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan de la Cruz Ignacio Moreno y Maisanove (VIAF: 89233790)
Juan de la Cruz Ignacio Cardinal Moreno y Maisanove (born , died ) Archbishop of Toledo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuatemala, Guatemala
Ordained BishopSan Isidro, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo
Death PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Toledo, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a priest for 35.1 years
  • a bishop for 26.7 years
  • a cardinal for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 431, and Page 558
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 580, and Page 50
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 164, Number 900
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1857, Number 53
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 Mar 1868

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017