Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Fanton

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Vicenza

Titular Bishop of Acelum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1910BornS. Tomio di Malo
10 Jul 193222.1Ordained PriestPriest of Vicenza, Italy
7 Jan 196756.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vicenza, Italy
7 Jan 196756.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Bennefa
24 Feb 196756.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bennefa
13 Nov 197666.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Acelum
31 Dec 198878.6RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Vicenza, Italy
26 Mar 199988.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Vicenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Fanton:
Bishop Carlo Fanton (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Vicenza

  • a priest for 66.7 years
  • a bishop for 32.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013