Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvador Emilio Riverón Cortina

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of San Cristobal de la Habana

Titular Bishop of Vergi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1948BornFlorida
3 Mar 198233.6Ordained PriestPriest of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
24 Apr 199950.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
24 Apr 199950.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Vergi
12 Jun 199950.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vergi
22 Feb 200455.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba

MicroData Summary for Salvador Emilio Riverón Cortina:
Bishop Salvador Emilio Riverón Cortina (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of San Cristobal de la Habana

  • a priest for 21.9 years
  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Number 13,568
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015