Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mariano Vivanco Valiente

Deceased

Bishop of Matanzas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1933BornSan Antonio de los Ba˝os
28 May 196128.2Ordained PriestPriest of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
18 May 198754.1AppointedBishop of Matanzas, Cuba
29 Jun 198754.2Ordained BishopBishop of Matanzas, Cuba
23 Aug 200471.4DiedBishop of Matanzas, Cuba

MicroData Summary for Mariano Vivanco Valiente:
Bishop Mariano Vivanco Valiente (born , died ) Bishop of Matanzas

  • a priest for 43.2 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Number 9,712
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013