Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfredo Víctor Petit Vergel

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of San Cristobal de la Habana

Titular Bishop of Buslacena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1936 BornLa Habana
23 Dec 196125.4Ordained PriestPriest of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
16 Nov 199155.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
16 Nov 199155.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Buslacena
12 Jan 199255.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Buslacena
26 Apr 201679.7RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba

MicroData Summary for Alfredo Víctor Petit Vergel
Bishop Alfredo Víctor Petit Vergel (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of San Cristobal de la Habana

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of San Cristobal de la Habana.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,653
  • r: Bollettino, 26 Apr 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 26 Apr 2016