Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Adolfo Rodríguez Herrera

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Camagüey, Cuba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1924Born
18 Jul 194824.2Ordained PriestPriest of Camagüey, Cuba
27 May 196339.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Camagüey, Cuba
27 May 196339.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiberiopolis
16 Jul 196339.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tiberiopolis
10 Sep 196440.4AppointedBishop of Camagüey, Cuba
5 Dec 199874.6AppointedArchbishop of Camagüey, Cuba
10 Jun 200278.1RetiredArchbishop of Camagüey, Cuba
10 May 200379.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Camagüey, Cuba

MicroData Summary for Adolfo Rodríguez Herrera
Archbishop Adolfo Rodríguez Herrera (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Camagüey

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMinas

  • a priest for 54.8 years
  • a bishop for 39.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 Jul 2017