Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomeu Manoel Mendes dos Reis

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mariana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1720BornCercosa, Portugal
21 Sep 174323.0Ordained PriestPriest
12 Dec 175232.3SelectedBishop of Macau, China
29 Jan 175332.4ConfirmedBishop of Macau, China
25 Jul 175332.9Ordained BishopBishop of Macau, China
29 Dec 177252.3SelectedBishop of Mariana, Brazil
8 Mar 177352.5ConfirmedBishop of Mariana, Brazil
28 Aug 177858.0ResignedBishop of Mariana, Brazil
7 Mar 179978.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Mariana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeu Manoel Mendes dos Reis:
Bishop Bartolomeu Manoel Mendes dos Reis (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mariana

  • a priest for 55.4 years
  • a bishop for 45.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1753, Number 14
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 271, and Page 277

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 1 Jan 2016