Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hilário de Santa Rosa, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Macau


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1693³BornLusitania, Portugal
27 Dec 171825.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
22 Feb 173945.9SelectedBishop of Macau, China
19 Dec 174047.7ConfirmedBishop of Macau, China
5 Mar 174148.0Ordained BishopBishop of Macau, China
18 Aug 175259.4ResignedBishop of Macau, China
30 Mar 176471.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Macau, China

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hilário de Santa Rosa:
Bishop Hilário de Santa Rosa O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Macau

  • a priest for 45.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 13
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 270

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 14 Dec 2015